Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Mobile Devices -see also- Telecommunications and IT

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0037
Title
Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0089
Title
Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0142
Title
Family Law - Opioid-Exposed Newborns and Parents Addicted to Opioids - Mobile Application (I'm Alive Today App)
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0143 (SB0308)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Providing Electronic Device Location Information - Historical Data
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0180 /CH0142
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Licenses and Identification Cards - Electronic Credentials
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0253
Title
Final Protective Orders – Relief – Transfer of Wireless Telephone Service
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0301 /CH0625 (SB0417/CH0626)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Race–Based Traffic Stops – Policy and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0382
Title
Election Law - Absentee and Provisional Ballots - Status Information
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0397 /CH0301 (SB0339/CH0302)
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0605 /CH0479 (SB0524/CH0480)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Telemedicine – Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners and Psychiatrists
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0654 (SB0937)
Title
Wireless Facilities - Installation and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243 (SB0805)
Title
Motor and Electric Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0308 (HB0143)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Providing Electronic Device Location Information - Historical Data
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0417 /CH0626 (HB0301/CH0625)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Race–Based Traffic Stops – Policy and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0423
Title
Task Force to Study the Impact of Student Cell Phone Use in the Classroom
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0678 /CH0407
Title
State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0743 /CH0403
Title
Election Law - Election Service Providers - Contract Clauses and Termination of Contract
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 (HB1243)
Title
Motor and Electric Scooter Sharing Companies - Nonvisual Access - Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0937 (HB0654)
Title
Wireless Facilities - Installation and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0037 Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0089 Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - Penalty Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0142 Family Law - Opioid-Exposed Newborns and Parents Addicted to Opioids - Mobile Application (I'm Alive Today App) Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0143 (SB0308) Criminal Procedure - Providing Electronic Device Location Information - Historical Data Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0180 /CH0142 Motor Vehicle Administration - Licenses and Identification Cards - Electronic Credentials Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0253 Final Protective Orders – Relief – Transfer of Wireless Telephone Service Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0301 /CH0625 (SB0417/CH0626) Vehicle Laws – Race–Based Traffic Stops – Policy and Reporting Requirements Delegate Wilkins 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 625
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0382 Election Law - Absentee and Provisional Ballots - Status Information Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0397 /CH0301 (SB0339/CH0302) Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law) Delegate Krebs 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0605 /CH0479 (SB0524/CH0480) Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Telemedicine – Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners and Psychiatrists Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0654 (SB0937) Wireless Facilities - Installation and Regulation Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1243 (SB0805) Motor and Electric Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access Delegate Attar 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0308 (HB0143) Criminal Procedure - Providing Electronic Device Location Information - Historical Data Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0417 /CH0626 (HB0301/CH0625) Vehicle Laws – Race–Based Traffic Stops – Policy and Reporting Requirements Senator Carter 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 626
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0423 Task Force to Study the Impact of Student Cell Phone Use in the Classroom Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0678 /CH0407 State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0743 /CH0403 Election Law - Election Service Providers - Contract Clauses and Termination of Contract Senator Pinsky 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0805 (HB1243) Motor and Electric Scooter Sharing Companies - Nonvisual Access - Workgroup Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Finance
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0937 (HB0654) Wireless Facilities - Installation and Regulation Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Finance
Finance
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM