Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Mobile Devices -see also- Telecommunications and IT

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0057
Title
Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2020
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0180
Title
Juveniles - Sexting
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0477 (SB0383)
Title
Court Order to Use a Cell Site Simulator or Obtain Location Information From an Electronic Device - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0518 (SB0432)
Title
Public Libraries - Electronic Literary Product Licenses - Access
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0800
Title
Natural Resources - Waters of the State - Mobile Locator Application
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940
Title
Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0989 (SB0714)
Title
Public Safety – 9–1–1 Emergency Telephone System – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1002 /CH0049
Title
Unemployment - Insurance Revisions and Special Enrollment Period for Health Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1020
Title
Election Law – Curbside Voting – Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1064
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Net Neutrality Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1082 (SB0863)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Enforcement and Use of Real–Time Digital Spotters
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0055 (SB0965)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0219 /CH0100
Title
Financial Institutions – Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Money Transmissions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0383 (HB0477)
Title
Court Order to Use a Cell Site Simulator or Obtain Location Information From an Electronic Device - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0432 (HB0518)
Title
Public Libraries - Electronic Literary Product Licenses - Access
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0714 (HB0989)
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0863 (HB1082)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Enforcement and Use of Real–Time Digital Spotters
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0893 /CH0065
Title
Unemployment - Insurance Revisions and Special Enrollment Period for Health Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0965 (HB1372/CH0055)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0057 Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2020 Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0180 Juveniles - Sexting Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0477 (SB0383) Court Order to Use a Cell Site Simulator or Obtain Location Information From an Electronic Device - Procedures Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0518 (SB0432) Public Libraries - Electronic Literary Product Licenses - Access Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
2/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0800 Natural Resources - Waters of the State - Mobile Locator Application Delegate Clark 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0940 Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation Speaker 6 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0989 (SB0714) Public Safety – 9–1–1 Emergency Telephone System – Alterations Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1002 /CH0049 Unemployment - Insurance Revisions and Special Enrollment Period for Health Benefits Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 49
Economic Matters
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1020 Election Law – Curbside Voting – Establishment Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1064 Commercial Law - Maryland Net Neutrality Act of 2021 Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1082 (SB0863) Vehicle Laws – Enforcement and Use of Real–Time Digital Spotters Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
HB1372 /CH0055 (SB0965) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions Speaker 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 55
Appropriations
3/15/2021 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
SB0219 /CH0100 Financial Institutions – Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Money Transmissions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Finance
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0383 (HB0477) Court Order to Use a Cell Site Simulator or Obtain Location Information From an Electronic Device - Procedures Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0432 (HB0518) Public Libraries - Electronic Literary Product Licenses - Access Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0714 (HB0989) Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Alterations Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0863 (HB1082) Vehicle Laws – Enforcement and Use of Real–Time Digital Spotters Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2021 - 12:30 PM
SB0893 /CH0065 Unemployment - Insurance Revisions and Special Enrollment Period for Health Benefits Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 65
Finance
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0965 (HB1372/CH0055) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 3:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2021 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:24 AM
Click to return on the top page