Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Mobile and Manufactured Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045 (SB0337)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794 /CH0640 (SB0696)
Title
Manufactured Homes - Affixation to Real Property - Liens
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1308 /CH0515 (SB0642/CH0514)
Title
Residential Property - Prohibition on Nonjudicial Evictions
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0337 (HB0045)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0407
Title
Real Property - Right to Redemption of Leased Premises - Forms of Payment
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0642 /CH0514 (HB1308/CH0515)
Title
Residential Property - Prohibition on Nonjudicial Evictions
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0696 (HB0794/CH0640)
Title
Manufactured Homes - Affixation to Real Property - Liens
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0045 (SB0337) Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environmental Matters
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0794 /CH0640 (SB0696) Manufactured Homes - Affixation to Real Property - Liens Delegate Niemann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 640
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1308 /CH0515 (SB0642/CH0514) Residential Property - Prohibition on Nonjudicial Evictions Delegate Healey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Environmental Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0337 (HB0045) Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0407 Real Property - Right to Redemption of Leased Premises - Forms of Payment Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0642 /CH0514 (HB1308/CH0515) Residential Property - Prohibition on Nonjudicial Evictions Senator Muse 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0696 (HB0794/CH0640) Manufactured Homes - Affixation to Real Property - Liens Senator Stone 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM