Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Mobile and Manufactured Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0249 /CH0489 (SB0345/CH0488)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0422 (SB0991)
Title
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0628 /CH0285 (SB0238/CH0284)
Title
Board of Public Works - Relocatable Classrooms - Indoor Air Quality Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0683
Title
Real Property - Residential and Mobile Home Park Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1403 /CH0109
Title
Homestead Exemption - Bankruptcy - Interest in Manufactured Home
Sponsor
Delegate Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0174
Title
Real Property - Right to Redemption of Leased Premises - Forms of Payment
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0238 /CH0284 (HB0628/CH0285)
Title
Board of Public Works - Relocatable Classrooms - Indoor Air Quality Requirements
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0345 /CH0488 (HB0249/CH0489)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0609
Title
Environment - Bay Restoration Fee - Mobile Home Park
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0991 (HB0422)
Title
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0249 /CH0489 (SB0345/CH0488) Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Delegate McMillan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Environmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0422 (SB0991) Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0628 /CH0285 (SB0238/CH0284) Board of Public Works - Relocatable Classrooms - Indoor Air Quality Requirements Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB0683 Real Property - Residential and Mobile Home Park Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1403 /CH0109 Homestead Exemption - Bankruptcy - Interest in Manufactured Home Delegate Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Judiciary
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0174 Real Property - Right to Redemption of Leased Premises - Forms of Payment Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0238 /CH0284 (HB0628/CH0285) Board of Public Works - Relocatable Classrooms - Indoor Air Quality Requirements Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0345 /CH0488 (HB0249/CH0489) Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Senator Muse 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0609 Environment - Bay Restoration Fee - Mobile Home Park Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0991 (HB0422) Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM