Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Mobile and Manufactured Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0053 (SB0063)
Title
Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0373
Title
Real Property - Candidates and Campaign Volunteers - Access to Private Residential Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0782 /CH0455 (SB0408)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1228
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Town of Capitol Heights Public Works Modular Home
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0063 (HB0053)
Title
Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0408 (HB0782/CH0455)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0053 (SB0063) Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0373 Real Property - Candidates and Campaign Volunteers - Access to Private Residential Areas Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0782 /CH0455 (SB0408) Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Delegate McMillan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1228 Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Town of Capitol Heights Public Works Modular Home Delegate Howard, C. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0063 (HB0053) Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0408 (HB0782/CH0455) Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Senator Muse 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM