Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Mobile and Manufactured Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0093 /CH0048 (SB0155/CH0049)
Title
Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0263
Title
Real Property - Sales of Mobile Home Parks - Notice Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1161 /CH0435
Title
Washington County - Mobile Home Tax - Authorization
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1389
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act – Geolocation Information and Unfair, Abusive, and Deceptive Trade Practices
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0155 /CH0049 (HB0093/CH0048)
Title
Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0093 /CH0048 (SB0155/CH0049) Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers Delegate Jackson, C. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 48
Economic Matters
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0263 Real Property - Sales of Mobile Home Parks - Notice Requirements Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1161 /CH0435 Washington County - Mobile Home Tax - Authorization Washington County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 435
Ways and Means
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1389 Maryland Personal Information Protection Act – Geolocation Information and Unfair, Abusive, and Deceptive Trade Practices Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0155 /CH0049 (HB0093/CH0048) Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers Senator Augustine 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 49
Finance
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/1/2020 2:37 PM