Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Monuments and Memorials

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0466 /CH0053 (SB0802/CH0052)
Title
Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0802 /CH0052 (HB0466/CH0053)
Title
Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act)
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0466 /CH0053 (SB0802/CH0052) Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act) Delegate Folden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0802 /CH0052 (HB0466/CH0053) Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act) Senator Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM