Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Monuments and Memorials

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0307 /CH0041
Title
Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0995
Title
State Government - President Barack Obama Statue - Placement and Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0999
Title
State House Trust - Lawyer's Mall - Maintenance
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1294 (SB0840)
Title
Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0840 (HB1294)
Title
Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0005
Title
Welcome Home Korean War Veterans Day
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0307 /CH0041 Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Judiciary
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0995 State Government - President Barack Obama Statue - Placement and Commission Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0999 State House Trust - Lawyer's Mall - Maintenance Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1294 (SB0840) Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0840 (HB1294) Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
SJ0005 Welcome Home Korean War Veterans Day Senator Carozza 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM