Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Mopeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0003
Title
Motor Vehicles - Mopeds and Motor Scooters - Valid Drivers' Licenses or Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0430 /CH0371
Title
Criminal Law - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption and Possession in Motor Vehicles
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0789 (SB0715/CH0309)
Title
Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911
Title
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Issuance, Renewal, and Expiration
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1179 (SB0472)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Special Dealer Decals
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0472 (HB1179)
Title
Worcester County - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Special Dealer Decals
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0715 /CH0309 (HB0789)
Title
Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0003 Motor Vehicles - Mopeds and Motor Scooters - Valid Drivers' Licenses or Permits Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0430 /CH0371 Criminal Law - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption and Possession in Motor Vehicles Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0789 (SB0715/CH0309) Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013 Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0911 Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Issuance, Renewal, and Expiration Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1179 (SB0472) Vehicle Laws - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Special Dealer Decals Delegate Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0472 (HB1179) Worcester County - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Special Dealer Decals Senator Mathias 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0715 /CH0309 (HB0789) Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013 Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM