Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Mortgages

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0274 /CH0592 (SB0708)
Title
Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency Judgments
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0366
Title
Home Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0453 /CH0229
Title
Housing and Community Development - Multifamily Rental Housing Programs Efficiency Act
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0553 /CH0410
Title
Housing - Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Loan Program
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 (SB0583/CH0306)
Title
Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings Accounts
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0923 /CH0529 (SB0596/CH0528)
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief - Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021
Title
Prince George's County - Foreclosure - Report by Department of Housing and Community Development and Commissioner of Financial Regulation PG 411-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1045 /CH0634
Title
Real Property - Lien Priority of Refinance Mortgages - Escrow Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1319
Title
Real Property - Foreclosures - Deficiency Judgments Prohibited and Definition of "Secured Party" (Foreclosure Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1322 (SB0755)
Title
Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and Study
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1346 (SB0850/CH0561)
Title
Real Property - Prohibition on Acquiring Mortgages or Deeds of Trust by Condemnation
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1527
Title
Real Property - Bankruptcy Proceedings - Expedited Foreclosure Timeline
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0230
Title
Real Property - Priority of Refinance Mortgage Over Junior Liens - Amount of Refinance Mortgage
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0583 /CH0306 (HB0735)
Title
Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0596 /CH0528 (HB0923/CH0529)
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief - Extension
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708 (HB0274/CH0592)
Title
Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency Judgments
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0755 (HB1322)
Title
Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and Study
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0850 /CH0561 (HB1346)
Title
Real Property - Prohibition on Acquiring Mortgages or Deeds of Trust by Condemnation and Related Study
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1091 /CH0579
Title
Financial Institutions - Registered Mortgage Loan Originators - Expedited Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0274 /CH0592 (SB0708) Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency Judgments Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 592
Environmental Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0366 Home Act of 2014 Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0453 /CH0229 Housing and Community Development - Multifamily Rental Housing Programs Efficiency Act Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Environmental Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0553 /CH0410 Housing - Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Loan Program Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0735 (SB0583/CH0306) Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings Accounts Delegate Olszewski 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0923 /CH0529 (SB0596/CH0528) Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief - Extension Delegate Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Ways and Means
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1021 Prince George's County - Foreclosure - Report by Department of Housing and Community Development and Commissioner of Financial Regulation PG 411-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environmental Matters
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1045 /CH0634 Real Property - Lien Priority of Refinance Mortgages - Escrow Costs Delegate Arora 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1319 Real Property - Foreclosures - Deficiency Judgments Prohibited and Definition of "Secured Party" (Foreclosure Protection Act) Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1322 (SB0755) Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and Study Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1346 (SB0850/CH0561) Real Property - Prohibition on Acquiring Mortgages or Deeds of Trust by Condemnation Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1527 Real Property - Bankruptcy Proceedings - Expedited Foreclosure Timeline Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0230 Real Property - Priority of Refinance Mortgage Over Junior Liens - Amount of Refinance Mortgage Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0583 /CH0306 (HB0735) Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings Accounts Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0596 /CH0528 (HB0923/CH0529) Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief - Extension Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0708 (HB0274/CH0592) Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency Judgments Senator Raskin 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0755 (HB1322) Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and Study Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0850 /CH0561 (HB1346) Real Property - Prohibition on Acquiring Mortgages or Deeds of Trust by Condemnation and Related Study Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1091 /CH0579 Financial Institutions - Registered Mortgage Loan Originators - Expedited Licenses Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 579
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM