Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Mortgages

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182 /CH0075
Title
Housing - Community Development Administration - Residential Mortgage Loans
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure - Prohibition on Deficiency Judgment
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929 (SB0756)
Title
Prince George's County - Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015 PG 423-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1129 (SB0837)
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1168
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure - Residential Property - Prefile Mediation
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1178 /CH0301
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemption - Purchase Money Mortgage or Purchase Money Deed of Trust
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1183 /CH0472 (SB0649)
Title
Real Property - Contract for Sale of New Home
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184 (SB0835)
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure Moratorium and Study (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015)
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1195 (SB0877)
Title
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1197 (SB0875)
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure - Owner-Occupied Residential Property - Prohibition on Collection of Deficiency
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1215 (SB0876)
Title
Foreclosure - Indorsement of Debt Instrument, Lost Note Affidavit, and Penalties for False Statements
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0325 /CH0025
Title
Life Insurers - Reserve Investments - Loans Secured by Real Estate
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0649 (HB1183/CH0472)
Title
Real Property - Contract for Sale of New Home
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0756 (HB0929)
Title
Prince George's County - Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0783
Title
Foreclosure Sales of Residential Property - Motion for Deficiency Judgment
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0835 (HB1184)
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure Moratorium and Study (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015)
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0875 (HB1197)
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure - Owner-Occupied Residential Property - Prohibition on Collection of Deficiency
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0876 (HB1215)
Title
Foreclosure - Indorsement of Debt Instrument, Lost Note Affidavit, and Penalties for False Statements
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 (HB1195)
Title
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0182 /CH0075 Housing - Community Development Administration - Residential Mortgage Loans Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0255 Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0840 Real Property - Foreclosure - Prohibition on Deficiency Judgment Delegate Knotts 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0929 (SB0756) Prince George's County - Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015 PG 423-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1129 (SB0837) Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1168 Real Property - Foreclosure - Residential Property - Prefile Mediation Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1178 /CH0301 Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemption - Purchase Money Mortgage or Purchase Money Deed of Trust Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1183 /CH0472 (SB0649) Real Property - Contract for Sale of New Home Delegate Knotts 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
HB1184 (SB0835) Real Property - Foreclosure Moratorium and Study (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015) Delegate Knotts 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1195 (SB0877) Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015 Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1197 (SB0875) Real Property - Foreclosure - Owner-Occupied Residential Property - Prohibition on Collection of Deficiency Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1215 (SB0876) Foreclosure - Indorsement of Debt Instrument, Lost Note Affidavit, and Penalties for False Statements Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0325 /CH0025 Life Insurers - Reserve Investments - Loans Secured by Real Estate Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 25
Finance
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0649 (HB1183/CH0472) Real Property - Contract for Sale of New Home Senator Muse 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0756 (HB0929) Prince George's County - Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015 Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe)
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0783 Foreclosure Sales of Residential Property - Motion for Deficiency Judgment Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0835 (HB1184) Real Property - Foreclosure Moratorium and Study (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015) Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0875 (HB1197) Real Property - Foreclosure - Owner-Occupied Residential Property - Prohibition on Collection of Deficiency Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0876 (HB1215) Foreclosure - Indorsement of Debt Instrument, Lost Note Affidavit, and Penalties for False Statements Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0877 (HB1195) Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015 Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM