Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Mortgages

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182
Title
Prince George's County - Vacant and Abandoned Residential Property - Foreclosure PG 404-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187 /CH0479 (SB0006)
Title
Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – Expansion
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0266
Title
Condominiums - Lien Priority - Unpaid Water and Sewer Charges
Sponsor
Delegate Rey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0279 /CH0104
Title
Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0408 /CH0539
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program PG/MC 103-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007 (SB0883)
Title
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1240
Title
Assisted Housing Preservation Act - Assisted Projects, Protected Actions, and Duties of the Department of Housing and Community Development
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1297 /CH0790
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Loans and Credit - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Aumann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1511 /CH0844
Title
Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1634 /CH0731 (SB1068/CH0732)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0006 (HB0187/CH0479)
Title
Financial Institutions - Nondepository Special Fund - Expansion
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0216
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Priority of Liens - Included Charges
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0566 /CH0845
Title
Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's Fee
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0755 /CH0340
Title
Credit Regulation - Escrow Accounts - Water and Sewer Facilities Assessments
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0883 (HB1007)
Title
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1068 /CH0732 (HB1634/CH0731)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0182 Prince George's County - Vacant and Abandoned Residential Property - Foreclosure PG 404-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0187 /CH0479 (SB0006) Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – Expansion Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Economic Matters
1/24/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0266 Condominiums - Lien Priority - Unpaid Water and Sewer Charges Delegate Rey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0279 /CH0104 Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education Requirements Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0408 /CH0539 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program PG/MC 103-18 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 539
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1007 (SB0883) Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1240 Assisted Housing Preservation Act - Assisted Projects, Protected Actions, and Duties of the Department of Housing and Community Development Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1297 /CH0790 Commercial Law - Consumer Loans and Credit - Miscellaneous Provisions Delegate Aumann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 790
Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1511 /CH0844 Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's Fee Delegate Mautz 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 844
Economic Matters
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1634 /CH0731 (SB1068/CH0732) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018 Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731
Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0006 (HB0187/CH0479) Financial Institutions - Nondepository Special Fund - Expansion Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0216 Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Priority of Liens - Included Charges Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0566 /CH0845 Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's Fee Senator Serafini 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 845
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0755 /CH0340 Credit Regulation - Escrow Accounts - Water and Sewer Facilities Assessments Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0883 (HB1007) Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1068 /CH0732 (HB1634/CH0731) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM