Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Morticians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0313 (SB0357)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments - Inspections
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0314 /CH0243 (SB0358/CH0242)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Authority to Discipline - Funeral Establishment Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0349 /CH0099
Title
Business Regulation - Cemeteries - Prohibited Acts and Penalties
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0529 /CH0376 (SB0463)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprentice Sponsors, Funeral Establishment Licenses, and Supervising Morticians
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1115 /CH0404 (SB0593)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1221
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Practice of Mortuary Science - Trade Names
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1290 (SB0837)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays
Sponsor
Delegate Frank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1471
Title
Health - Statistics and Records - Electronic Filing of Death Certificates
Sponsor
Delegate Myers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0357 (HB0313)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments - Inspections
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0358 /CH0242 (HB0314/CH0243)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Authority to Discipline - Funeral Establishment Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0463 (HB0529/CH0376)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprentice Sponsors, Funeral Establishment Licenses, and Supervising Morticians
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0593 (HB1115/CH0404)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837 (HB1290)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0313 (SB0357) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments - Inspections Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0314 /CH0243 (SB0358/CH0242) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Authority to Discipline - Funeral Establishment Licenses Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0349 /CH0099 Business Regulation - Cemeteries - Prohibited Acts and Penalties Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0529 /CH0376 (SB0463) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprentice Sponsors, Funeral Establishment Licenses, and Supervising Morticians Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 376
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1115 /CH0404 (SB0593) Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judicial Proceedings
HB1221 State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Practice of Mortuary Science - Trade Names Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1290 (SB0837) Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays Delegate Frank 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1471 Health - Statistics and Records - Electronic Filing of Death Certificates Delegate Myers 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0357 (HB0313) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments - Inspections Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0358 /CH0242 (HB0314/CH0243) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Authority to Discipline - Funeral Establishment Licenses Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0463 (HB0529/CH0376) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprentice Sponsors, Funeral Establishment Licenses, and Supervising Morticians Senator Conway 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0593 (HB1115/CH0404) Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability Senator Montgomery 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0837 (HB1290) Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM