Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Morticians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0593 (SB0415/CH0497)
Title
Morticians and Funeral Directors - Pre-Need Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1031 (SB0586/CH0308)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments - Unannounced Inspections
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1042 (SB0648/CH0322)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of Death
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1239 (SB0775)
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Pre-Need Contracts and Unclaimed Cremains - Reporting and Audit Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1264 (SB0121)
Title
Public Safety - Removal of Dead Bodies - Police Presence
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1456 /CH0457
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1466
Title
Morticians and Funeral Directors - Contracts - Statement Regarding Availability of Internal Organs for Burial
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0121 (HB1264)
Title
Public Safety - Removal of Dead Bodies - Police Presence
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0415 /CH0497 (HB0593)
Title
Morticians and Funeral Directors - Pre-Need Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0586 /CH0308 (HB1031)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments - Unannounced Inspections
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0648 /CH0322 (HB1042)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of Death
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0775 (HB1239)
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Pre-Need Contracts and Unclaimed Cremains - Reporting and Audit Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0593 (SB0415/CH0497) Morticians and Funeral Directors - Pre-Need Contracts Delegate Krebs 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1031 (SB0586/CH0308) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments - Unannounced Inspections Delegate Anderson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1042 (SB0648/CH0322) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of Death Delegate Anderson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1239 (SB0775) Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Pre-Need Contracts and Unclaimed Cremains - Reporting and Audit Requirements Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1264 (SB0121) Public Safety - Removal of Dead Bodies - Police Presence Delegate Swain 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1456 /CH0457 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1466 Morticians and Funeral Directors - Contracts - Statement Regarding Availability of Internal Organs for Burial Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0121 (HB1264) Public Safety - Removal of Dead Bodies - Police Presence Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0415 /CH0497 (HB0593) Morticians and Funeral Directors - Pre-Need Contracts Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0586 /CH0308 (HB1031) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments - Unannounced Inspections Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0648 /CH0322 (HB1042) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of Death Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 322
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0775 (HB1239) Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Pre-Need Contracts and Unclaimed Cremains - Reporting and Audit Requirements Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM