Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Morticians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0098 (SB0070)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Orders of Summary Suspension - Prohibition on Stays
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0127
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Alteration of Dates for Termination Provisions and Sunset Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0190
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Crematories - Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0193 (SB0446)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Staff - Designation and Duties of Executive Director
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0321 (SB0159)
Title
Funeral Establishments - Pre-Need Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0463 /CH0249
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishment Licenses - Ownership and Operation Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0491
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Conservation Cemeteries - Perpetual Care Trust Fund Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0561 /CH0433
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Notice of Member Vacancies
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0729 /CH0452 (SB0160)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Cease and Desist Orders and Injunctive Relief - Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0070 (HB0098)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Orders of Summary Suspension - Stays
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0159 (HB0321)
Title
Funeral Establishments - Pre-Need Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0160 (HB0729/CH0452)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Cease and Desist Orders and Injunctive Relief - Authority
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0391 /CH0167
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Licenses, Permits, and Registrations - Processes and Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0433 /CH0349
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Disposition
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0446 (HB0193)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Staff - Designation and Duties of Executive Director
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0690
Title
Public Safety - Removal of Dead Bodies - Police Presence
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0098 (SB0070) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Orders of Summary Suspension - Prohibition on Stays Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0127 State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Alteration of Dates for Termination Provisions and Sunset Program Evaluation Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0190 Office of Cemetery Oversight - State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Crematories - Fees Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0193 (SB0446) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Staff - Designation and Duties of Executive Director Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0321 (SB0159) Funeral Establishments - Pre-Need Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0463 /CH0249 State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishment Licenses - Ownership and Operation Requirements Delegate Young, K. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0491 Office of Cemetery Oversight - Conservation Cemeteries - Perpetual Care Trust Fund Requirements Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0561 /CH0433 State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Notice of Member Vacancies Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0729 /CH0452 (SB0160) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Cease and Desist Orders and Injunctive Relief - Authority Delegate Angel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0070 (HB0098) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Orders of Summary Suspension - Stays Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0159 (HB0321) Funeral Establishments - Pre-Need Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0160 (HB0729/CH0452) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Cease and Desist Orders and Injunctive Relief - Authority Senator Montgomery 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0391 /CH0167 State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Licenses, Permits, and Registrations - Processes and Criminal History Records Checks Senator Montgomery 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0433 /CH0349 Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Disposition Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Finance
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0446 (HB0193) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Staff - Designation and Duties of Executive Director Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0690 Public Safety - Removal of Dead Bodies - Police Presence Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM