Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motion Pictures

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0043 /CH0583
Title
Criminal Law - Harassment - Revenge Porn
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0064
Title
Criminal Law - Intentional Disclosure of Sexually Explicit Image of Another Person Without Consent
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0098 (SB0154/CH0042)
Title
Commercial Law - Interference With Internet Ticket Sales - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0295 /CH0262 (SB0331)
Title
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0520 (SB1051)
Title
Business and Economic Development - Film Production Activity Tax Credit Program
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154 /CH0042 (HB0098)
Title
Commercial Law - Interference With Internet Ticket Sales - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0331 (HB0295/CH0262)
Title
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1051 (HB0520)
Title
Business and Economic Development - Film Production Activity Tax Credit Program
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0043 /CH0583 Criminal Law - Harassment - Revenge Porn Delegate Simmons 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0064 Criminal Law - Intentional Disclosure of Sexually Explicit Image of Another Person Without Consent Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0098 (SB0154/CH0042) Commercial Law - Interference With Internet Ticket Sales - Prohibition Delegate Arora 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0295 /CH0262 (SB0331) Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0520 (SB1051) Business and Economic Development - Film Production Activity Tax Credit Program Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0154 /CH0042 (HB0098) Commercial Law - Interference With Internet Ticket Sales - Prohibition Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Finance
1/22/2014 - 1:45 PM
Economic Matters
SB0331 (HB0295/CH0262) Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/17/2014 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB1051 (HB0520) Business and Economic Development - Film Production Activity Tax Credit Program Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM