Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motion Pictures

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0206 (SB0518)
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License - Movie Theaters PG 303-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0549
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations on Municipal Corporations
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0616 (SB0020)
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Small or Independent Film Entities
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1449 (SB1154/CH0595)
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0020 (HB0616)
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Small or Independent Film Entities
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0518 (HB0206)
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Family Entertainment Permit and Class BLX License for Movie Theaters
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1154 /CH0595 (HB1449)
Title
Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0206 (SB0518) Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License - Movie Theaters PG 303-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0549 Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations on Municipal Corporations Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0616 (SB0020) Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Small or Independent Film Entities Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1449 (SB1154/CH0595) Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0020 (HB0616) Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Small or Independent Film Entities Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:15 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/24/2018 - 2:15 PM
SB0518 (HB0206) Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Family Entertainment Permit and Class BLX License for Movie Theaters Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1154 /CH0595 (HB1449) Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – Alterations Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM