Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motion Pictures

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0185 /CH0583 (SB0352/CH0584)
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License for Movie Theaters PG 302-19
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0289 /CH0614 (SB0273/CH0615)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cinema/Theater License
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0369
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations on Municipal Corporations - Drive-In Movies and Roller Skating Rinks
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0482 /CH0544
Title
Income Tax Credits – Endowments of Maryland Historically Black Colleges and Universities and Film Production Activity – Establishment and Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1335 (SB0955/CH0768)
Title
Kent County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 /CH0615 (HB0289/CH0614)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cinema/Theater License
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0352 /CH0584 (HB0185/CH0583)
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License for Movie Theaters
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0955 /CH0768 (HB1335)
Title
Kent County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2019
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0185 /CH0583 (SB0352/CH0584) Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License for Movie Theaters PG 302-19 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0289 /CH0614 (SB0273/CH0615) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cinema/Theater License Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 614
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0369 Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations on Municipal Corporations - Drive-In Movies and Roller Skating Rinks Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0482 /CH0544 Income Tax Credits – Endowments of Maryland Historically Black Colleges and Universities and Film Production Activity – Establishment and Alterations Delegate Mosby 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Ways and Means
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1335 (SB0955/CH0768) Kent County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2019 Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0273 /CH0615 (HB0289/CH0614) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cinema/Theater License Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 615
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0352 /CH0584 (HB0185/CH0583) Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License for Movie Theaters Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 584
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0955 /CH0768 (HB1335) Kent County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2019 Senator Hershey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 768
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM