Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Motion Pictures

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0322 (SB0612)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cinema/Theater License
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0565
Title
Income Tax – Business and Economic Development Tax Credits – Termination, Alteration, and Evaluation
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0651 (SB0360)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0932 (SB1001)
Title
21st–Century Economy Fairness Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1284
Title
State Tax Credits, Exemptions, and Deductions - Alterations and Repeal (Tax Modernization Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1523
Title
Human Relations - Public Accommodations - Captioning in Movie Theaters (Open Captioning Equality Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0360 (HB0651)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0385 (HB0923)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0612 (HB0322)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cinema/Theater License
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0718
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1001 (HB0932)
Title
21st–Century Economy Fairness Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0322 (SB0612) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cinema/Theater License Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0565 Income Tax – Business and Economic Development Tax Credits – Termination, Alteration, and Evaluation Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0651 (SB0360) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0932 (SB1001) 21st–Century Economy Fairness Act Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1284 State Tax Credits, Exemptions, and Deductions - Alterations and Repeal (Tax Modernization Act) Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1523 Human Relations - Public Accommodations - Captioning in Movie Theaters (Open Captioning Equality Act of 2020) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0360 (HB0651) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License Senator Beidle 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0385 (HB0923) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License Harford County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0612 (HB0322) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cinema/Theater License Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0718 Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Alterations Senator Griffith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1001 (HB0932) 21st–Century Economy Fairness Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/19/2020 11:17 AM