Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motorcycles and Motor Scooters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0003
Title
Motor Vehicles - Mopeds and Motor Scooters - Valid Drivers' Licenses or Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0374 (SB0212/CH0206)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Motorcycles - Individuals with Disabilities
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0430 /CH0371
Title
Criminal Law - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption and Possession in Motor Vehicles
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0445
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road - Overtaking Another Vehicle
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0500
Title
Vehicle Laws - Motorcycles - Expiration of Learner's Instructional Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0523 /CH0484 (SB0486/CH0483)
Title
Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle Law
Sponsor
Delegate Myers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1179 (SB0472)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Special Dealer Decals
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0212 /CH0206 (HB0374)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Motorcycles - Individuals with Disabilities
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0246
Title
Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0472 (HB1179)
Title
Worcester County - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Special Dealer Decals
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 /CH0483 (HB0523/CH0484)
Title
Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle Law
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0003 Motor Vehicles - Mopeds and Motor Scooters - Valid Drivers' Licenses or Permits Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0374 (SB0212/CH0206) Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Motorcycles - Individuals with Disabilities Delegate Malone 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0430 /CH0371 Criminal Law - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption and Possession in Motor Vehicles Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0445 Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road - Overtaking Another Vehicle Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0500 Vehicle Laws - Motorcycles - Expiration of Learner's Instructional Permit Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0523 /CH0484 (SB0486/CH0483) Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle Law Delegate Myers 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1179 (SB0472) Vehicle Laws - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Special Dealer Decals Delegate Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0212 /CH0206 (HB0374) Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Motorcycles - Individuals with Disabilities Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0246 Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0472 (HB1179) Worcester County - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Special Dealer Decals Senator Mathias 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0486 /CH0483 (HB0523/CH0484) Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle Law Senator Brinkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM