Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motorcycles and Motor Scooters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0052 (SB0808)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Motor Scooters - Rules of the Road
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0092
Title
Vehicle Laws - Passing a Bicycle, an Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device, or a Motor Scooter - Distance Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0205
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycle - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0241
Title
Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor Scooters
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0477 (SB0173)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0530 (SB0520/CH0514)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Motor Scooters - Operation on Roadways
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540
Title
Motor Vehicles - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Titling for Nonresidents
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0666 (SB0640)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting Motorcycles
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1421
Title
Vehicle Laws - Motorcycles - Learners' Instructional Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1423
Title
Vehicle Laws - Motorcycles - Learners' Instructional Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0033 /CH0006
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road - Use of High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0173 (HB0477)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0520 /CH0514 (HB0530)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Motor Scooters - Operation on Roadways
Sponsor
Senator Robey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 (HB0666)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting Motorcycles
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0808 (HB0052)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Motor Scooters - Rules of the Road
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0052 (SB0808) Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Motor Scooters - Rules of the Road Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0092 Vehicle Laws - Passing a Bicycle, an Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device, or a Motor Scooter - Distance Requirement Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0205 Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycle - Definition Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0241 Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor Scooters Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0477 (SB0173) Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0530 (SB0520/CH0514) Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Motor Scooters - Operation on Roadways Delegate Malone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0540 Motor Vehicles - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Titling for Nonresidents Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0666 (SB0640) Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting Motorcycles Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1421 Vehicle Laws - Motorcycles - Learners' Instructional Permits Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1423 Vehicle Laws - Motorcycles - Learners' Instructional Permits Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0033 /CH0006 Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road - Use of High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0173 (HB0477) Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0520 /CH0514 (HB0530) Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Motor Scooters - Operation on Roadways Senator Robey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0640 (HB0666) Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting Motorcycles Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0808 (HB0052) Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Motor Scooters - Rules of the Road Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM