Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motorcycles and Motor Scooters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0570
Title
Prince George's County - Emergency Medical Services - Motorcycle Unit PG 305-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0588 (SB0547)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor Scooters
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0609
Title
Prince George's County - Motorcycle Operators - Penalties for Speed Violations PG 311-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0717
Title
Vehicle Laws - Evidence of Required Security - Carrying While Operating Vehicle
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0917 /CH0287 (SB0716)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting Motorcycles
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0918 (SB0727)
Title
Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - Training
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0547 (HB0588)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor Scooters
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0612
Title
Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0716 (HB0917/CH0287)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting Motorcycles
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0727 (HB0918)
Title
Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - Training
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0570 Prince George's County - Emergency Medical Services - Motorcycle Unit PG 305-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0588 (SB0547) Vehicle Laws - Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor Scooters Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0609 Prince George's County - Motorcycle Operators - Penalties for Speed Violations PG 311-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0717 Vehicle Laws - Evidence of Required Security - Carrying While Operating Vehicle Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0917 /CH0287 (SB0716) Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting Motorcycles Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0918 (SB0727) Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - Training Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0547 (HB0588) Vehicle Laws - Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor Scooters Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0612 Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0716 (HB0917/CH0287) Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting Motorcycles Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0727 (HB0918) Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - Training Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM