Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motorcycles and Motor Scooters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 /CH0608
Title
Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Authorized Uses and Inspections
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0214 (SB1123)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor Scooters
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0392 (SB0274)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Retired Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0426
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Motor Scooters - Use of Bike Lanes
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0559
Title
Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0688
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0785 (SB0233/CH0542)
Title
Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - Training
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0805 (SB0774/CH0231)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1199
Title
Prince George's County - Emergency Medical Services - Motorcycle Unit PG 312-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0164
Title
Vehicle Laws - Motorcycles - Restrictions on Child Passengers
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0233 /CH0542 (HB0785)
Title
Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - Training
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 (HB0392)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Retired Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0774 /CH0231 (HB0805)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1123 (HB0214)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor Scooters
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 /CH0608 Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Authorized Uses and Inspections Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0214 (SB1123) Vehicle Laws - Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor Scooters Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0392 (SB0274) Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Retired Law Enforcement Officers Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0426 Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Motor Scooters - Use of Bike Lanes Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0559 Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0688 Vehicle Laws - Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device - Definition Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0785 (SB0233/CH0542) Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - Training Delegate Anderson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0805 (SB0774/CH0231) Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and Requirements Delegate Beidle 2 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1199 Prince George's County - Emergency Medical Services - Motorcycle Unit PG 312-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0164 Vehicle Laws - Motorcycles - Restrictions on Child Passengers Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0233 /CH0542 (HB0785) Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - Training Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 542
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0274 (HB0392) Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Retired Law Enforcement Officers Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0774 /CH0231 (HB0805) Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and Requirements Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1123 (HB0214) Vehicle Laws - Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor Scooters Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM