Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0112 (SB0804)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0398 (SB0354)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, EPAMDs, or Motor Scooters
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0421 /CH0648 (SB0196/CH0649)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operator's Permits - Indication of Applicant's Sex
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0507
Title
Baltimore County and Harford County – Motorcycles – Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0917
Title
Motor Vehicles - Motorcycles - Overtaking and Passing Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243 (SB0805)
Title
Motor and Electric Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0014
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Electric Transportation Devices - Definitions
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0070 /CH0139
Title
Vehicle Laws – HOV Lanes – Hybrid Vehicles
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196 /CH0649 (HB0421/CH0648)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operator's Permits - Indication of Applicant's Sex
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0804 (HB0112)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Reckless Driving Contributing to an Accident – Required Court Appearance
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 (HB1243)
Title
Motor and Electric Scooter Sharing Companies - Nonvisual Access - Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0981
Title
Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0112 (SB0804) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0398 (SB0354) Vehicle Laws – Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, EPAMDs, or Motor Scooters Delegate Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0421 /CH0648 (SB0196/CH0649) Vehicle Laws - Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operator's Permits - Indication of Applicant's Sex Delegate Love 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 648
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0507 Baltimore County and Harford County – Motorcycles – Sunday Sales Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 In the House - House Requests Senate Recede
Economic Matters
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0917 Motor Vehicles - Motorcycles - Overtaking and Passing Vehicles Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1243 (SB0805) Motor and Electric Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access Delegate Attar 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0014 Vehicle Laws - Personal Electric Transportation Devices - Definitions Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0070 /CH0139 Vehicle Laws – HOV Lanes – Hybrid Vehicles Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0196 /CH0649 (HB0421/CH0648) Vehicle Laws - Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operator's Permits - Indication of Applicant's Sex Senator Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 649
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0804 (HB0112) Vehicle Laws – Reckless Driving Contributing to an Accident – Required Court Appearance Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0805 (HB1243) Motor and Electric Scooter Sharing Companies - Nonvisual Access - Workgroup Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Finance
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0981 Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM