Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Repair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0698
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Compensation for Dealer Services
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0247 /CH0258
Title
Rental and Replacement Vehicles - Age-Based Service Determinations - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1044
Title
Labor and Employment - Motor Vehicle Repair and Career Certification Program for Ex-Offenders
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0698 Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Compensation for Dealer Services Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-2)
Economic Matters
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0247 /CH0258 Rental and Replacement Vehicles - Age-Based Service Determinations - Prohibition Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Finance
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1044 Labor and Employment - Motor Vehicle Repair and Career Certification Program for Ex-Offenders Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM