Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0290
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With Dealers
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0344 /CH0395 (SB0344)
Title
Charles County - Sunday Car Sales Blue Law Exemption - Enabling Authority
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0941 (SB0536)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Motor Vehicle Commission - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1275 (SB0687/CH0326)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With Dealers
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0344 (HB0344/CH0395)
Title
Charles County - Sunday Car Sales Blue Law Exemption - Enabling Authority
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0536 (HB0941)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Motor Vehicle Commission - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0687 /CH0326 (HB1275)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With Dealers
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0290 Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With Dealers Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0344 /CH0395 (SB0344) Charles County - Sunday Car Sales Blue Law Exemption - Enabling Authority Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Economic Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0941 (SB0536) Vehicle Laws - Motor Vehicle Commission - Establishment Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1275 (SB0687/CH0326) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With Dealers Delegate Frush 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0344 (HB0344/CH0395) Charles County - Sunday Car Sales Blue Law Exemption - Enabling Authority Senator Middleton 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0536 (HB0941) Vehicle Laws - Motor Vehicle Commission - Establishment Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0687 /CH0326 (HB1275) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With Dealers Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 326
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM