Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0235 /CH0231
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Distributors - Sale of Electric or Nonfossil-Fuel Burning Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0313 /CH0157 (SB0298/CH0156)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0568 (SB0587)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0833 (SB0558)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship With Dealers
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1078 (SB0559)
Title
Vehicle Law - Dealers' Facilities - Internet Locations
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0298 /CH0156 (HB0313/CH0157)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0553 /CH0039
Title
Motor Clubs - Scope of Law - Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0558 (HB0833)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship With Dealers
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0559 (HB1078)
Title
Vehicle Law - Dealers' Facilities - Internet Locations
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0587 (HB0568)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0235 /CH0231 Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Distributors - Sale of Electric or Nonfossil-Fuel Burning Vehicles Delegate Reznik 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0313 /CH0157 (SB0298/CH0156) Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing Agreements Delegate Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0568 (SB0587) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0833 (SB0558) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship With Dealers Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1078 (SB0559) Vehicle Law - Dealers' Facilities - Internet Locations Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0298 /CH0156 (HB0313/CH0157) Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing Agreements Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0553 /CH0039 Motor Clubs - Scope of Law - Fees Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0558 (HB0833) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship With Dealers Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0559 (HB1078) Vehicle Law - Dealers' Facilities - Internet Locations Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0587 (HB0568) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM