Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0525 /CH0720 (SB0730)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0675 /CH0494 (SB0414)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0982 (SB0666)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0986 /CH0728
Title
Vehicle Laws - Trade-In Allowance - Leased Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414 (HB0675/CH0494)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0666 (HB0982)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0730 (HB0525/CH0720)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0525 /CH0720 (SB0730) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers Delegate Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 720
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0675 /CH0494 (SB0414) Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts Delegate Branch 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Economic Matters
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0982 (SB0666) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0986 /CH0728 Vehicle Laws - Trade-In Allowance - Leased Vehicles Delegate Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 728
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0414 (HB0675/CH0494) Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts Senator Brochin 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0666 (HB0982) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0730 (HB0525/CH0720) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM