Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0263 /CH0683
Title
School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Exclusion of Vehicle Rental Companies - Repeal and Notification Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0756 /CH0747
Title
Vehicle Laws - Annual Vehicle Shows
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1120 /CH0560 (SB1004)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Performance Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0020
Title
Wicomico County - Vehicle Dealer's Licenses - Motor Home and Travel Trailer Shows
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0566
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1004 (HB1120/CH0560)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Performance Standards
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0263 /CH0683 School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Exclusion of Vehicle Rental Companies - Repeal and Notification Requirement Delegate Carr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 683
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2017 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0756 /CH0747 Vehicle Laws - Annual Vehicle Shows Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 747
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1120 /CH0560 (SB1004) Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Performance Standards Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0020 Wicomico County - Vehicle Dealer's Licenses - Motor Home and Travel Trailer Shows Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0566 Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1004 (HB1120/CH0560) Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Performance Standards Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM