Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0507
Title
Baltimore County and Harford County – Motorcycles – Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0610 (SB0526)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Advertisements
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0698
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Compensation for Dealer Services
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0899
Title
Biennial Motor Vehicle Safety and Equipment Inspections - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0084 /CH0140
Title
Vehicle Laws - Certificate of Title Application - Signature Requirement
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0247 /CH0258
Title
Rental and Replacement Vehicles - Age-Based Service Determinations - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0526 (HB0610)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Advertisements
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0806
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Dealer Processing and Freight Charges
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0507 Baltimore County and Harford County – Motorcycles – Sunday Sales Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 In the House - House Requests Senate Recede
Economic Matters
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0610 (SB0526) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Advertisements Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0698 Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Compensation for Dealer Services Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-2)
Economic Matters
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0899 Biennial Motor Vehicle Safety and Equipment Inspections - Required Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
SB0084 /CH0140 Vehicle Laws - Certificate of Title Application - Signature Requirement Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0247 /CH0258 Rental and Replacement Vehicles - Age-Based Service Determinations - Prohibition Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Finance
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0526 (HB0610) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Advertisements Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0806 Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Dealer Processing and Freight Charges Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM