Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0139 /CH0071 (SB0134/CH0072)
Title
Consumer Protection - Electronic Transactions - Sale and Lease of Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0164 /CH0090
Title
Harford County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0212 (SB0178)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Advertisements
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0232 /CH0118
Title
Maryland Zero Emission Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Council - Reporting, Membership, and Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0600 /CH0270 (SB1021)
Title
Baltimore County – Motorcycles – Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0655
Title
Commercial Law – Automobile Financing Charges – Required Dealer Disclosures
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1064 /CH0417 (SB0813/CH0418)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Transfers of Franchises
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0134 /CH0072 (HB0139/CH0071)
Title
Consumer Protection – Electronic Transactions – Sale and Lease of Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0178 (HB0212)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Prices Listed on Dealer Websites
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0813 /CH0418 (HB1064/CH0417)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Transfers of Franchises
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1021 (HB0600/CH0270)
Title
Baltimore County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0139 /CH0071 (SB0134/CH0072) Consumer Protection - Electronic Transactions - Sale and Lease of Vehicles Delegate Crosby 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 71
Economic Matters
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0164 /CH0090 Harford County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales Harford County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 90
Economic Matters
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0212 (SB0178) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Advertisements Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0232 /CH0118 Maryland Zero Emission Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Council - Reporting, Membership, and Sunset Extension Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 118
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
HB0600 /CH0270 (SB1021) Baltimore County – Motorcycles – Sunday Sales Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 270
Economic Matters
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0655 Commercial Law – Automobile Financing Charges – Required Dealer Disclosures Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate Dumais) Adopted
Economic Matters
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1064 /CH0417 (SB0813/CH0418) Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Transfers of Franchises Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 417
Economic Matters
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0134 /CH0072 (HB0139/CH0071) Consumer Protection – Electronic Transactions – Sale and Lease of Vehicles Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 72
Finance
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0178 (HB0212) Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Prices Listed on Dealer Websites Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0813 /CH0418 (HB1064/CH0417) Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Transfers of Franchises Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 418
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2020 - 12:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1021 (HB0600/CH0270) Baltimore County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/1/2020 2:37 PM