Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Equipment

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
Drunk Driving - Transporting Minor - Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0036
Title
Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety Seats
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0122
Title
Commercial Law - Automotive Repair Facilities - Tire Repairs
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135
Title
Environment - Motor Vehicle Batteries - Recycling
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0158 (SB0192)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Child Safety Seats and Seat Belts - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0693
Title
Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety Seats
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885
Title
Vehicle Laws - Equipment - Prohibition on Counterfeit Airbags and Substandard Airbags
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1110
Title
Consumer Protection - Sales of Tires - Limitations and Required Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB0886)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with Dealers
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1149
Title
Vehicle Laws - Stopping, Standing, and Parking - Plug-In Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1235
Title
Vehicle Laws - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Tinted Windows
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1375
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1392 (SB0943)
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Decentralization - Study
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1415
Title
Vehicle Laws - Former School Vehicles - Rules of the Road and Equipment
Sponsor
Delegate Myers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0075 /CH0019
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Investigative Division - Issuance of Citations
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0087 /CH0179
Title
Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety Seats
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116
Title
Commercial Law - Cancellation of Sales of Motor Vehicles and Internet Sales
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0192 (HB0158)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Child Safety Seats and Seat Belts - Penalty
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0499
Title
Vehicle Laws - Obstruction of Driver's View
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0886 (HB1139)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with Dealers
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0943 (HB1392)
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Decentralization - Study
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 Drunk Driving - Transporting Minor - Ignition Interlock System Program Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/23/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0036 Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety Seats Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0122 Commercial Law - Automotive Repair Facilities - Tire Repairs Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0135 Environment - Motor Vehicle Batteries - Recycling Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0158 (SB0192) Vehicle Laws - Child Safety Seats and Seat Belts - Penalty Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0693 Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety Seats Delegate Conway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0885 Vehicle Laws - Equipment - Prohibition on Counterfeit Airbags and Substandard Airbags Delegate Mitchell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1110 Consumer Protection - Sales of Tires - Limitations and Required Notice Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 (SB0886) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with Dealers Delegate Frush 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1149 Vehicle Laws - Stopping, Standing, and Parking - Plug-In Vehicles Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1235 Vehicle Laws - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Tinted Windows Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1375 Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1392 (SB0943) Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Decentralization - Study Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1415 Vehicle Laws - Former School Vehicles - Rules of the Road and Equipment Delegate Myers 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
SB0075 /CH0019 Motor Vehicle Administration - Investigative Division - Issuance of Citations Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 19
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0087 /CH0179 Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety Seats Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0116 Commercial Law - Cancellation of Sales of Motor Vehicles and Internet Sales Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0192 (HB0158) Vehicle Laws - Child Safety Seats and Seat Belts - Penalty Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0499 Vehicle Laws - Obstruction of Driver's View Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0886 (HB1139) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with Dealers Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0943 (HB1392) Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Decentralization - Study Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM