Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Equipment

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0028 (SB0443)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Hidden Compartments - Prohibition and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032 (SB0442)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Tinted Windows
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0126 (SB0723)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Seat Belt Use - Exemption for Individuals Delivering Printed Publications
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0290
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With Dealers
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0538
Title
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574 (SB0487)
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0580
Title
Consumer Protection - Sales of Tires - Limitations and Required Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1015 /CH0631
Title
Drunk Driving - Transporting a Minor - Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1230
Title
Vehicle Laws - Signal Devices on Personal Vehicles - Fire Police
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1241
Title
Motor Vehicles - Use of Headlights When Windshield Wipers Operating - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1275 (SB0687/CH0326)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With Dealers
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1311
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Aftermarket Parts - Warranty Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0006 /CH0003
Title
Vehicle Laws - Preventive Maintenance Program - Preventive Maintenance Technician
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0072 /CH0013
Title
Motor Vehicles - Weight and Axle Load Limits
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0087 /CH0017
Title
Drunk Driving - Ignition Interlock System Program - Repeat Offenders
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0378 /CH0294
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycle - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0443 (HB0028)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Hidden Compartments - Prohibition and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0487 (HB0574)
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0687 /CH0326 (HB1275)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With Dealers
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0723 (HB0126)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Seat Belt Use - Exemption for Individuals Delivering Printed Publications
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0773
Title
Automated Motor Vehicles - Titling, Registration, and Rules of the Road
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0028 (SB0443) Vehicle Laws - Hidden Compartments - Prohibition and Penalties Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0032 (SB0442) Vehicle Laws - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Tinted Windows Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0126 (SB0723) Vehicle Laws - Seat Belt Use - Exemption for Individuals Delivering Printed Publications Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0290 Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With Dealers Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0538 Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0574 (SB0487) Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0580 Consumer Protection - Sales of Tires - Limitations and Required Notice Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1015 /CH0631 Drunk Driving - Transporting a Minor - Ignition Interlock System Program Delegate Arora 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 631
Judiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1230 Vehicle Laws - Signal Devices on Personal Vehicles - Fire Police Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1241 Motor Vehicles - Use of Headlights When Windshield Wipers Operating - Enforcement Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1275 (SB0687/CH0326) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With Dealers Delegate Frush 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1311 Motor Vehicle Insurance - Aftermarket Parts - Warranty Requirements Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0006 /CH0003 Vehicle Laws - Preventive Maintenance Program - Preventive Maintenance Technician Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0072 /CH0013 Motor Vehicles - Weight and Axle Load Limits Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0087 /CH0017 Drunk Driving - Ignition Interlock System Program - Repeat Offenders Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0378 /CH0294 Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycle - Definition Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0443 (HB0028) Vehicle Laws - Hidden Compartments - Prohibition and Penalties Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0487 (HB0574) Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0687 /CH0326 (HB1275) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With Dealers Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 326
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0723 (HB0126) Vehicle Laws - Seat Belt Use - Exemption for Individuals Delivering Printed Publications Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0773 Automated Motor Vehicles - Titling, Registration, and Rules of the Road Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM