Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Equipment

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0097 (SB0125)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Window Tinting Restrictions - Medical Exemption for Vehicle Owner's Family
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172 (SB0778)
Title
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233 /CH0080
Title
Motor Vehicles - Calculation of Length - Loading Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0423 (SB0212)
Title
Driving Under the Influence - Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0430 /CH0247
Title
Drunk Driving - Accidents Resulting in Death - Sanctions for Administrative Per Se Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0454 (SB0664)
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0510 /CH0427
Title
Montgomery County - Education - School Bus - Doors That Lock MC 27-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0630 /CH0444
Title
Mechanical Repair Contracts - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0654
Title
Prince George's County - Unattended Motor Vehicle - Exception to Prohibition PG 313-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0872
Title
Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0125 (HB0097)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Window Tinting Restrictions - Medical Exemption for Vehicle Owner's Family
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0212 (HB0423)
Title
Driving Under the Influence - Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0395
Title
Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0462
Title
Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts - Definition and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664 (HB0454)
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0778 (HB0172)
Title
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0097 (SB0125) Vehicle Laws - Window Tinting Restrictions - Medical Exemption for Vehicle Owner's Family Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0172 (SB0778) Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0233 /CH0080 Motor Vehicles - Calculation of Length - Loading Devices Delegate Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0423 (SB0212) Driving Under the Influence - Ignition Interlock System Program Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
HB0430 /CH0247 Drunk Driving - Accidents Resulting in Death - Sanctions for Administrative Per Se Offenses Delegate Folden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0454 (SB0664) Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0510 /CH0427 Montgomery County - Education - School Bus - Doors That Lock MC 27-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0630 /CH0444 Mechanical Repair Contracts - Requirements Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Economic Matters
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0654 Prince George's County - Unattended Motor Vehicle - Exception to Prohibition PG 313-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0872 Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2015 Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
SB0125 (HB0097) Vehicle Laws - Window Tinting Restrictions - Medical Exemption for Vehicle Owner's Family Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0212 (HB0423) Driving Under the Influence - Ignition Interlock System Program Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0395 Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2015 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0462 Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts - Definition and Requirements Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0664 (HB0454) Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0778 (HB0172) Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM