Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Inspection

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 /CH0608
Title
Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Authorized Uses and Inspections
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0189 (SB0348)
Title
Environment - Liquid Waste Hauler - Vehicle License and Inspection
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547
Title
Motor Vehicles - Tires, Exterior Lights, and Windshield Wipers - Biennial Inspection
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0635
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Recall or Remediation - Documentation of Repairs
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0125
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348 (HB0189)
Title
Environment - Liquid Waste Hauler - Vehicle License and Inspection
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 /CH0608 Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Authorized Uses and Inspections Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0189 (SB0348) Environment - Liquid Waste Hauler - Vehicle License and Inspection Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0547 Motor Vehicles - Tires, Exterior Lights, and Windshield Wipers - Biennial Inspection Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0635 Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Recall or Remediation - Documentation of Repairs Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0125 Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Exemptions Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0348 (HB0189) Environment - Liquid Waste Hauler - Vehicle License and Inspection Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM