Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Inspection

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0316
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Exemptions - Vehicles With Low Annual Mileage
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1759
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle Rentals
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0044
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Buses - Inspection, Repair, and Maintenance Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0743 /CH0852 (HB1045)
Title
Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing Programs
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0316 Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Exemptions - Vehicles With Low Annual Mileage Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1759 Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle Rentals Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0044 Vehicle Laws - School Buses - Inspection, Repair, and Maintenance Requirements Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0743 /CH0852 (HB1045) Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing Programs Senator Middleton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852
Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM