Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Inspection

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032 (SB0282)
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Prohibition on Suspension or Revocation of Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0052
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Exemptions - Vehicles With Low Annual Mileage
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0151 (SB0168)
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2019
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0899
Title
Biennial Motor Vehicle Safety and Equipment Inspections - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0915
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Extension - Out-of-State Students
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0943
Title
Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003 /CH0471 (SB0436/CH0472)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0168 (HB0151)
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2019
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0282 (HB0032)
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Prohibition on Suspension or Revocation of Registration
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0436 /CH0472 (HB1003/CH0471)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 (SB0282) Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Prohibition on Suspension or Revocation of Registration Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2019 - 2:30 PM
HB0052 Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Exemptions - Vehicles With Low Annual Mileage Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0151 (SB0168) Clean Cars Act of 2019 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0899 Biennial Motor Vehicle Safety and Equipment Inspections - Required Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0915 Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Extension - Out-of-State Students Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0943 Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1003 /CH0471 (SB0436/CH0472) Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Economic Matters
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0168 (HB0151) Clean Cars Act of 2019 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0282 (HB0032) Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Prohibition on Suspension or Revocation of Registration Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0436 /CH0472 (HB1003/CH0471) Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Finance
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM