Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Insurance -see also- MD Auto Insurance Fund

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0071
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Underwriting Based on Geographic Area
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0342 /CH0270 (SB0446/CH0269)
Title
Homeowner's or Renter's Insurance and Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Bundling Requirement - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0392 /CH0111
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Personal Injury Protection Coverage - Prohibition on Premium Increase
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0764 (SB0803)
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Personal Injury Protection and Uninsured Motorist Coverages - Limitation
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0987
Title
Punitive Damages - High-Risk Drunk Drivers
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089 (SB0919)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Required Security
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1117
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Mandatory Coverage - Medical and Hospital Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Donoghue
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1375
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1519 (SB0735)
Title
Insurance - Premium Financing
Sponsor
Delegate Donoghue
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0043
Title
Courts - Evidence - Vehicle Repair Estimates
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0446 /CH0269 (HB0342/CH0270)
Title
Homeowner's or Renter's Insurance and Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Bundling Requirement - Prohibited
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0568
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Motorist Benefits - Procedural Requirements for Filing Claims
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0735 (HB1519)
Title
Insurance - Premium Financing
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0803 (HB0764)
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Personal Injury Protection and Uninsured Motorist Coverages - Limitation
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0891
Title
Courts - Service of Process - Driver of Motor Vehicle or Driver's Estate
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0919 (HB1089)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicle Companies - Right of Indemnification
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0930 /CH0334
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Premium Payments - Acceptance on Installment Payment Basis and Premium Finance Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0950
Title
Personal Automobile Insurance - Rescission of Policy or Binder - Misrepresentations by Applicant
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0071 Homeowner's Insurance - Underwriting Based on Geographic Area Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0342 /CH0270 (SB0446/CH0269) Homeowner's or Renter's Insurance and Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Bundling Requirement - Prohibited Delegate Hucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Economic Matters
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0392 /CH0111 Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Personal Injury Protection Coverage - Prohibition on Premium Increase Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Economic Matters
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0764 (SB0803) Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Personal Injury Protection and Uninsured Motorist Coverages - Limitation Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0987 Punitive Damages - High-Risk Drunk Drivers Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1089 (SB0919) Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Required Security Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Finance
Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1117 Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Mandatory Coverage - Medical and Hospital Benefits Delegate Donoghue 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1375 Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1519 (SB0735) Insurance - Premium Financing Delegate Donoghue 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0043 Courts - Evidence - Vehicle Repair Estimates Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0446 /CH0269 (HB0342/CH0270) Homeowner's or Renter's Insurance and Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Bundling Requirement - Prohibited Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Finance
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0568 Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Motorist Benefits - Procedural Requirements for Filing Claims Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0735 (HB1519) Insurance - Premium Financing Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0803 (HB0764) Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Personal Injury Protection and Uninsured Motorist Coverages - Limitation Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0891 Courts - Service of Process - Driver of Motor Vehicle or Driver's Estate Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0919 (HB1089) Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicle Companies - Right of Indemnification Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Finance
Finance
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0930 /CH0334 Property and Casualty Insurance - Premium Payments - Acceptance on Installment Payment Basis and Premium Finance Agreements Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0950 Personal Automobile Insurance - Rescission of Policy or Binder - Misrepresentations by Applicant Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM