Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Insurance -see also- MD Auto Insurance Fund

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0130 (SB0153/CH0041)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Task Force to Study Methods to Reduce the Rate of Uninsured Drivers
Sponsor
Delegate Rudolph
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0478 (SB0053/CH0009)
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Installment Payment Plan - Clarification
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574 (SB0487)
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0730 (SB0662)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicle Companies - Right of Subrogation
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1146 (SB0844)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Underinsured Motorist Excess Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1160 (SB0919)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1290
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration - Historic Motor Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1311
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Aftermarket Parts - Warranty Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1462 (SB0977/CH0364)
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Notices - Use of First-Class Mail Tracking Methods
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0053 /CH0009 (HB0478)
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Installment Payment Plan - Clarification
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0153 /CH0041 (HB0130)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Task Force to Study Methods to Reduce the Rate of Uninsured Drivers
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0456 /CH0169
Title
Insurance - Definition of Premium - Inclusion of Motor Vehicle Driving Record Report and Accident History Report Fees
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0487 (HB0574)
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0662 (HB0730)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicle Companies - Right of Subrogation
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0844 (HB1146)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Underinsured Motorist Excess Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0919 (HB1160)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0977 /CH0364 (HB1462)
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Notices - Use of First-Class Mail Tracking Methods
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0130 (SB0153/CH0041) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Task Force to Study Methods to Reduce the Rate of Uninsured Drivers Delegate Rudolph 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0478 (SB0053/CH0009) Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Installment Payment Plan - Clarification Delegate Davis 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0574 (SB0487) Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0730 (SB0662) Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicle Companies - Right of Subrogation Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1146 (SB0844) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Underinsured Motorist Excess Coverage Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1160 (SB0919) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Establishment Delegate Barnes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1290 Vehicle Laws - Registration - Historic Motor Vehicles Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1311 Motor Vehicle Insurance - Aftermarket Parts - Warranty Requirements Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1462 (SB0977/CH0364) Property and Casualty Insurance - Notices - Use of First-Class Mail Tracking Methods Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0053 /CH0009 (HB0478) Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Installment Payment Plan - Clarification Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Finance
1/09/2014 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0153 /CH0041 (HB0130) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Task Force to Study Methods to Reduce the Rate of Uninsured Drivers Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Finance
1/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0456 /CH0169 Insurance - Definition of Premium - Inclusion of Motor Vehicle Driving Record Report and Accident History Report Fees Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0487 (HB0574) Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0662 (HB0730) Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicle Companies - Right of Subrogation Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0844 (HB1146) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Underinsured Motorist Excess Coverage Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0919 (HB1160) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Establishment Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0977 /CH0364 (HB1462) Property and Casualty Insurance - Notices - Use of First-Class Mail Tracking Methods Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Finance
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM