Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Insurance -see also- MD Auto Insurance Fund

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0313 /CH0157 (SB0298/CH0156)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0700 (SB0436)
Title
Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Prior Approval Rate Making - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0717
Title
Vehicle Laws - Evidence of Required Security - Carrying While Operating Vehicle
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0719
Title
District Court Jurisdiction - Uninsured Motorist Claim
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0732 (SB0770/CH0051)
Title
Insurance - Motor Vehicle Rental Companies - Limited Lines License to Sell Insurance
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0972
Title
Insurance - Transportation Network Insurance - Requirements and Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0974
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Daylight Driving Discount for Seniors
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1093 (SB0614)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1231 (SB0868/CH0204)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1253 (SB0910/CH0208)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Entry-Level Commercial Truck Driver's License Holders - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0142 /CH0016
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Premium Finance Companies - Assignment of Rights and Obligations - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0298 /CH0156 (HB0313/CH0157)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0436 (HB0700)
Title
Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Prior Approval Rate Making - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0553 /CH0039
Title
Motor Clubs - Scope of Law - Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0605
Title
Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive Damages
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0608
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Notices, Policies, and Proof of Insurance - Electronic Format
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0614 (HB1093)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0749
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0770 /CH0051 (HB0732)
Title
Insurance - Motor Vehicle Rental Companies - Limited Lines License to Sell Insurance
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868 /CH0204 (HB1231)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0910 /CH0208 (HB1253)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Entry-Level Commercial Truck Driver's License Holders - Study
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0313 /CH0157 (SB0298/CH0156) Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing Agreements Delegate Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0700 (SB0436) Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Prior Approval Rate Making - Exemptions Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0717 Vehicle Laws - Evidence of Required Security - Carrying While Operating Vehicle Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0719 District Court Jurisdiction - Uninsured Motorist Claim Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0732 (SB0770/CH0051) Insurance - Motor Vehicle Rental Companies - Limited Lines License to Sell Insurance Delegate Vaughn 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0972 Insurance - Transportation Network Insurance - Requirements and Coverage Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0974 Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Daylight Driving Discount for Seniors Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1093 (SB0614) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1231 (SB0868/CH0204) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/13 at 9:45 a.m.
Economic Matters
4/13/2015 - 9:45 AM
HB1253 (SB0910/CH0208) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Entry-Level Commercial Truck Driver's License Holders - Study Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0142 /CH0016 Property and Casualty Insurance - Premium Finance Companies - Assignment of Rights and Obligations - Repeal of Termination Date Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Finance
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0298 /CH0156 (HB0313/CH0157) Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing Agreements Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0436 (HB0700) Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Prior Approval Rate Making - Exemptions Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0553 /CH0039 Motor Clubs - Scope of Law - Fees Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0605 Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive Damages Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0608 Property and Casualty Insurance - Notices, Policies, and Proof of Insurance - Electronic Format Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0614 (HB1093) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0749 Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Prohibitions Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0770 /CH0051 (HB0732) Insurance - Motor Vehicle Rental Companies - Limited Lines License to Sell Insurance Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51
Finance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0868 /CH0204 (HB1231) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Finance
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0910 /CH0208 (HB1253) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Entry-Level Commercial Truck Driver's License Holders - Study Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM