Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Insurance -see also- MD Auto Insurance Fund

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0005 /CH0020 (SB0403/CH0815)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603 /CH0345
Title
Vehicle Laws - Out-of-State Vehicles - Required Security
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0916 /CH0639
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1013 (SB0902)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Safe Autonomous Vehicle (SAVE) Act
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1224
Title
Environment - Liquid Waste Hauler - Vehicle License and Inspection
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1295 (SB0533)
Title
Low-Cost Automobile Insurance Program
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385 (SB0961)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1520 (SB1056)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle Rentals
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0034 /CH0344
Title
Motor Vehicles - Leased Vehicles - Inspections, Insurance, and Excise Tax
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0289 /CH0514
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Rate Making for Automobile and Homeowner's Insurance
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0290 /CH0725
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance Policies - Placement and Reinstatement
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0403 /CH0815 (HB0005/CH0020)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0533 (HB1295)
Title
Low-Cost Automobile Insurance Program
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0534 /CH0640
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0902 (HB1013)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Safe Autonomous Vehicle (SAVE) Act
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0961 (HB1385)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1007
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1056 (HB1520)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle Rentals
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0005 /CH0020 (SB0403/CH0815) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage Delegate Barkley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20
Economic Matters
1/18/2017 - 1:30 PM
Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 PM
HB0603 /CH0345 Vehicle Laws - Out-of-State Vehicles - Required Security Delegate Parrott 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0916 /CH0639 Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Prohibitions Delegate Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Economic Matters
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1013 (SB0902) Vehicle Laws - Safe Autonomous Vehicle (SAVE) Act Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1224 Environment - Liquid Waste Hauler - Vehicle License and Inspection Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1295 (SB0533) Low-Cost Automobile Insurance Program Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1385 (SB0961) Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1520 (SB1056) Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle Rentals Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0034 /CH0344 Motor Vehicles - Leased Vehicles - Inspections, Insurance, and Excise Tax Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2017 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0289 /CH0514 Maryland Insurance Administration - Rate Making for Automobile and Homeowner's Insurance Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Finance
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0290 /CH0725 Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance Policies - Placement and Reinstatement Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 725
Finance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0403 /CH0815 (HB0005/CH0020) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage Senator Astle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 815
Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0533 (HB1295) Low-Cost Automobile Insurance Program Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0534 /CH0640 Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Prohibitions Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 640
Finance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0902 (HB1013) Vehicle Laws - Safe Autonomous Vehicle (SAVE) Act Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0961 (HB1385) Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1007 Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB1056 (HB1520) Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle Rentals Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM