Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Insurance -see also- MD Auto Insurance Fund

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0329 (SB0233)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Use of Occupation or Education Level
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0351 (SB0235)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0379 /CH0114
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Commercial Policies - Notice and Quotes
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0675
Title
Operation of Uninsured Motor Vehicle - Criminal Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0782 (SB0691)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0949
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Use of Territory
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003 /CH0471 (SB0436/CH0472)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1038
Title
Insurance - Guaranteed Automobile Protection - Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1042
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Total Loss Value
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1072 /CH0226 (SB0701)
Title
Transportation Network Companies - Insurance
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0101 /CH0748
Title
Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0102
Title
Courts – Direct Action Against Automobile Insurer
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0233 (HB0329)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Use of Occupation or Education Level
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0235 (HB0351)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0436 /CH0472 (HB1003/CH0471)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691 (HB0782)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0701 (HB1072/CH0226)
Title
Transportation Network Companies - Insurance
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0707 /CH0287
Title
Motor Vehicles - Temporary In-Transit Registration
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0329 (SB0233) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Use of Occupation or Education Level Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0351 (SB0235) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0379 /CH0114 Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Commercial Policies - Notice and Quotes Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Economic Matters
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0675 Operation of Uninsured Motor Vehicle - Criminal Penalties Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/20/2019 - 11:00 AM
HB0782 (SB0691) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0949 Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Use of Territory Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1003 /CH0471 (SB0436/CH0472) Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Economic Matters
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1038 Insurance - Guaranteed Automobile Protection - Liability Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1042 Motor Vehicle Insurance - Total Loss Value Delegate Boteler 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1072 /CH0226 (SB0701) Transportation Network Companies - Insurance Delegate Brooks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Economic Matters
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0101 /CH0748 Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance Coverage Senator Zirkin 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 748
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0102 Courts – Direct Action Against Automobile Insurer Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0233 (HB0329) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Use of Occupation or Education Level Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0235 (HB0351) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0436 /CH0472 (HB1003/CH0471) Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Finance
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0691 (HB0782) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019) Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0701 (HB1072/CH0226) Transportation Network Companies - Insurance Senator Kramer 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0707 /CH0287 Motor Vehicles - Temporary In-Transit Registration Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM