Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Registration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0077
Title
Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate - Class L (Historic) Vehicles and Class N (Street Rod) Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575 (SB0221/CH0146)
Title
Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized Use
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1190
Title
Vehicle Laws - Licenses and Registrations - Notice of Suspension or Revocation
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1290
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration - Historic Motor Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1553
Title
Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Camping Trailers
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0004
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Appalachian Trail
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0221 /CH0146 (HB0575)
Title
Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized Use
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0629
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Vehicle Registration Fee Surcharge
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0773
Title
Automated Motor Vehicles - Titling, Registration, and Rules of the Road
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0077 Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate - Class L (Historic) Vehicles and Class N (Street Rod) Vehicles Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0575 (SB0221/CH0146) Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized Use Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1190 Vehicle Laws - Licenses and Registrations - Notice of Suspension or Revocation Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1290 Vehicle Laws - Registration - Historic Motor Vehicles Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1553 Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Camping Trailers Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0004 Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Appalachian Trail Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0221 /CH0146 (HB0575) Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized Use Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0629 Counties and Municipalities - Vehicle Registration Fee Surcharge Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0773 Automated Motor Vehicles - Titling, Registration, and Rules of the Road Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM