Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Murder

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0295 (SB0276/CH0156)
Title
Death Penalty Repeal and Appropriation from Savings to Aid Survivors of Homicide Victims
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0477
Title
Firearms - Conviction for Crime of Violence - Probation Before Judgment
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0478 (SB0861)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0699 (SB0416)
Title
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0709 /CH0635 (SB0444)
Title
Criminal Law - Accessory After the Fact - Murder (The Sheddy-Bennett Act)
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0909 /CH0650 (SB0872)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Venue for Prosecution of Murder and Manslaughter
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1043
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Multiple Murders
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1211 /CH0486 (SB0489/CH0485)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1354
Title
Real Property - Disclosure Requirements - Death by Other Than Natural Causes
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0276 /CH0156 (HB0295)
Title
Death Penalty Repeal - Substitution of Life Without the Possibility of Parole
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0416 (HB0699)
Title
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0444 (HB0709/CH0635)
Title
Criminal Law - Accessory After the Fact - Murder (The Sheddy-Bennett Act)
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0480
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder on School or Child Care Facility Property
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0489 /CH0485 (HB1211/CH0486)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 (HB0478)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0872 (HB0909/CH0650)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Venue for Prosecution of Murder and Manslaughter
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0295 (SB0276/CH0156) Death Penalty Repeal and Appropriation from Savings to Aid Survivors of Homicide Victims Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/14/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0477 Firearms - Conviction for Crime of Violence - Probation Before Judgment Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2013 - 12:00 PM
HB0478 (SB0861) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0699 (SB0416) Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0709 /CH0635 (SB0444) Criminal Law - Accessory After the Fact - Murder (The Sheddy-Bennett Act) Delegate McDermott 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 635
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0909 /CH0650 (SB0872) Criminal Procedure - Venue for Prosecution of Murder and Manslaughter Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 650
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1043 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Multiple Murders Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/14/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1211 /CH0486 (SB0489/CH0485) Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law) Delegate Schulz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1354 Real Property - Disclosure Requirements - Death by Other Than Natural Causes Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0276 /CH0156 (HB0295) Death Penalty Repeal - Substitution of Life Without the Possibility of Parole President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/08/2013 - 12:30 PM
SB0416 (HB0699) Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0444 (HB0709/CH0635) Criminal Law - Accessory After the Fact - Murder (The Sheddy-Bennett Act) Senator Stone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0480 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder on School or Child Care Facility Property Senator Getty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0489 /CH0485 (HB1211/CH0486) Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law) Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 485
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0861 (HB0478) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0872 (HB0909/CH0650) Criminal Procedure - Venue for Prosecution of Murder and Manslaughter Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM