Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Murder

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0168
Title
Criminal Law - Second-Degree Murder - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0263 /CH0233
Title
Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders - Conspiracy or Solicitation to Commit Murder
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0434
Title
Courts - Aggravated Murder Court
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046
Title
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1054
Title
Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - Law Enforcement Officer
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1083 (SB0550)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1135
Title
Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing Proceeding
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0082
Title
Criminal Law - Second-Degree Murder - Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0137
Title
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Crimes - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0550 (HB1083)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0849
Title
Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Jury Sentencing Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0168 Criminal Law - Second-Degree Murder - Penalty Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0263 /CH0233 Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders - Conspiracy or Solicitation to Commit Murder Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0434 Courts - Aggravated Murder Court Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0457 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1046 Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1054 Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - Law Enforcement Officer Delegate Folden 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1083 (SB0550) Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1135 Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing Proceeding Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0082 Criminal Law - Second-Degree Murder - Penalty Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0137 Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Crimes - Statute of Limitations Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0550 (HB1083) Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0849 Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Jury Sentencing Repeal Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Raskin)
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM