Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Murder

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0520 (SB0447)
Title
Correctional Services - Murder - Diminution Credits
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0653 /CH0647
Title
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0881
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Officers, and First Responders
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1215 (SB0983)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1392
Title
Task Force to Study the Imposition of Life Without the Possibility of Parole for Persons Found Guilty of Murder in the First Degree
Sponsor
Delegate Sanchez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0387 /CH0648
Title
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0447 (HB0520)
Title
Correctional Services - Murder - Diminution Credits
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0958
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0983 (HB1215)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1187
Title
Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing Proceeding
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0520 (SB0447) Correctional Services - Murder - Diminution Credits Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0653 /CH0647 Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647
Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0881 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Officers, and First Responders Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1215 (SB0983) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1392 Task Force to Study the Imposition of Life Without the Possibility of Parole for Persons Found Guilty of Murder in the First Degree Delegate Sanchez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0387 /CH0648 Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0447 (HB0520) Correctional Services - Murder - Diminution Credits Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0958 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0983 (HB1215) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Senator Muse 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1187 Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing Proceeding Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM