Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Murder

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0454 (SB0490/CH0497)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying Information
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0579 (SB0210)
Title
Correctional Services - Murder - Diminution Credits
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0748 (SB0533)
Title
Criminal Law – Homicide – Unborn Child (Laura and Reid’s Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0761
Title
Courts - Aggravated Murder Court
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0778
Title
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0813
Title
Public Safety - Community Program Fund - Firearm Laws
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass Murder
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1134 (SB0800)
Title
Criminal Law – Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practices – Sexual Activity With an Animal
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1411 (SB0346)
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Reinstatement
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1787
Title
State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1807 (SB1250)
Title
Criminal Law - Threat of Mass Violence and Deadly Weapons on Public School Property
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0210 (HB0579)
Title
Correctional Services - Murder - Diminution Credits
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0346 (HB1411)
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Reinstatement
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0412
Title
Task Force on Baltimore City Department of Social Services Oversight
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0490 /CH0497 (HB0454)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying Information
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0533 (HB0748)
Title
Criminal Law – Homicide – Unborn Child (Laura and Reid’s Law)
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0800 (HB1134)
Title
Criminal Law – Sexual Activity With an Animal, Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practices, and Sodomy
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0816
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1250 (HB1807)
Title
Criminal Law – Threat of Mass Violence
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0454 (SB0490/CH0497) Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying Information Delegate Moon 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0579 (SB0210) Correctional Services - Murder - Diminution Credits Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0748 (SB0533) Criminal Law – Homicide – Unborn Child (Laura and Reid’s Law) Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0761 Courts - Aggravated Murder Court Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0778 Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder - Penalty Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0813 Public Safety - Community Program Fund - Firearm Laws Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0887 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass Murder Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1134 (SB0800) Criminal Law – Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practices – Sexual Activity With an Animal Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1411 (SB0346) Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Reinstatement Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1787 State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1807 (SB1250) Criminal Law - Threat of Mass Violence and Deadly Weapons on Public School Property Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0210 (HB0579) Correctional Services - Murder - Diminution Credits Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB0346 (HB1411) Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Reinstatement Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0412 Task Force on Baltimore City Department of Social Services Oversight Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0490 /CH0497 (HB0454) Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying Information Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0533 (HB0748) Criminal Law – Homicide – Unborn Child (Laura and Reid’s Law) Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0800 (HB1134) Criminal Law – Sexual Activity With an Animal, Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practices, and Sodomy Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0816 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1250 (HB1807) Criminal Law – Threat of Mass Violence Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM