Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Murder

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0215 (SB0005/CH0297)
Title
Public Information Act - 9-1-1 Communications - Denial of Part of a Public Record
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0218 /CH0232 (SB0147/CH0231)
Title
Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0307 /CH0041
Title
Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0399 (SB0311)
Title
End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0493 /CH0246
Title
Crimes – Solicitation and Conspiracy to Commit Murder Resulting in Death (Stacey’s Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0743 (SB0242)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility - Dismissal of Charges
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0757 (SB0561/CH0388)
Title
Criminal Law - Homicide - Fetus
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0764 (SB0148)
Title
Correctional Services - Murder - Diminution Credits
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0005 /CH0297 (HB0215)
Title
Public Information Act - 9-1-1 Communications - Denial of Part of a Public Record
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0147 /CH0231 (HB0218/CH0232)
Title
Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0148 (HB0764)
Title
Correctional Services - Murder - Diminution Credits
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0198 /CH0247
Title
Crimes - Solicitation and Conspiracy to Commit Murder Resulting in Death (Stacey's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0242 (HB0743)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility - Dismissal of Charges
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0295
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0311 (HB0399)
Title
End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act)
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0561 /CH0388 (HB0757)
Title
Criminal Law – Crime of Violence Against Pregnant Person – Enhanced Penalty (Laura and Reid’s Law)
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0626
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0215 (SB0005/CH0297) Public Information Act - 9-1-1 Communications - Denial of Part of a Public Record Delegate Jackson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2019 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0218 /CH0232 (SB0147/CH0231) Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2019 - 2:00 PM
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0307 /CH0041 Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Judiciary
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0399 (SB0311) End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act) Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2019 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
2/15/2019 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0493 /CH0246 Crimes – Solicitation and Conspiracy to Commit Murder Resulting in Death (Stacey’s Law) Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Judiciary
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0743 (SB0242) Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility - Dismissal of Charges Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0757 (SB0561/CH0388) Criminal Law - Homicide - Fetus Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0764 (SB0148) Correctional Services - Murder - Diminution Credits Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0005 /CH0297 (HB0215) Public Information Act - 9-1-1 Communications - Denial of Part of a Public Record Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2019 - 4:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0147 /CH0231 (HB0218/CH0232) Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Finance
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0148 (HB0764) Correctional Services - Murder - Diminution Credits Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0198 /CH0247 Crimes - Solicitation and Conspiracy to Commit Murder Resulting in Death (Stacey's Law) Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0242 (HB0743) Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility - Dismissal of Charges Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0295 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0311 (HB0399) End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act) Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Failed
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0561 /CH0388 (HB0757) Criminal Law – Crime of Violence Against Pregnant Person – Enhanced Penalty (Laura and Reid’s Law) Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0626 Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM