Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Murder

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0484
Title
Courts - Aggravated Murder Court
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0488 (SB0554)
Title
Crimes – Mitigation – Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0643 (SB0701)
Title
End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0831
Title
Criminal Law - Attempt to Commit Second-Degree Murder - Penalty (Justice Reinvestment Act - Modification)
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0933
Title
Juvenile Offenders - Dual Sentencing
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB1010)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1265
Title
Correctional Services - Murder - Diminution Credits
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1308 (SB0919)
Title
Criminal Law – Felony First–Degree Murder – Limitation and Review of Conviction
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1322
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Mass Murder (Capital Gazette Shooting Memorial Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1338
Title
Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1592 (SB1044)
Title
State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1637
Title
Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission - Reporting and Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0235
Title
Criminal Law - Attempt to Commit Second-Degree Murder - Penalty
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0516
Title
Correctional Services – Murder – Diminution Credits (Geraldine’s Law)
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0554 (HB0488)
Title
Crimes - Mitigation - Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0701 (HB0643)
Title
End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0919 (HB1308)
Title
Criminal Law - Task Force to Study Felony Murder
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0951
Title
Criminal Law - Felony First-Degree Murder - Limitation and Resentencing Procedure
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 (HB1139)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1044 (HB1592)
Title
State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1073
Title
Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility - Dismissal of Charges
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1078
Title
Public Safety - Emergency Powers of the Governor - Violent Crime Crisis
Sponsor
Minority Leader
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0484 Courts - Aggravated Murder Court Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0488 (SB0554) Crimes – Mitigation – Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0643 (SB0701) End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act) Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
Judiciary
HB0831 Criminal Law - Attempt to Commit Second-Degree Murder - Penalty (Justice Reinvestment Act - Modification) Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0933 Juvenile Offenders - Dual Sentencing Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 (SB1010) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1265 Correctional Services - Murder - Diminution Credits Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1308 (SB0919) Criminal Law – Felony First–Degree Murder – Limitation and Review of Conviction Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1322 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Mass Murder (Capital Gazette Shooting Memorial Act) Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
HB1338 Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1592 (SB1044) State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1637 Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission - Reporting and Sunset Extension Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
SB0235 Criminal Law - Attempt to Commit Second-Degree Murder - Penalty Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0516 Correctional Services – Murder – Diminution Credits (Geraldine’s Law) Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0554 (HB0488) Crimes - Mitigation - Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0701 (HB0643) End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0919 (HB1308) Criminal Law - Task Force to Study Felony Murder Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0951 Criminal Law - Felony First-Degree Murder - Limitation and Resentencing Procedure Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB1010 (HB1139) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB1044 (HB1592) State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1073 Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility - Dismissal of Charges Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1078 Public Safety - Emergency Powers of the Governor - Violent Crime Crisis Minority Leader 6 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 5:02 PM