Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Museums

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0094
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2006 - Anne Arundel County - Chesapeake Children's Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0358 (SB0257)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Montgomery County - Sandy Spring Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0580 (SB0352)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - National Electronics Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0973 (SB0723)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Kids International Discovery Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1039 (SB0883)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - The Baltimore Museum of Industry Capital Improvements
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1148 /CH0297 (SB0592/CH0296)
Title
Natural Resources - Shark Fins - Restriction on Possession or Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1473
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Arthur & Mary E. Ridgley, Sr. Museum Phase I
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1516
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2003 - Baltimore City - Carroll Mansion Museum
Sponsor
Delegate McHale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1521
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2005 - Baltimore City - Babe Ruth Birthplace and Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0046
Title
Natural Resources - Shark or Elasmobranch Fins - Restriction on Possession, Distribution, or Consumption
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0257 (HB0358)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Montgomery County - Sandy Spring Museum
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0352 (HB0580)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - National Electronics Museum
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0592 /CH0296 (HB1148/CH0297)
Title
Natural Resources - Shark Fins - Restriction on Possession or Distribution
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0723 (HB0973)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Kids International Discovery Museum
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0883 (HB1039)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - The Baltimore Museum of Industry Capital Improvements
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1050
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - College Park Aviation Museum
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0094 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2006 - Anne Arundel County - Chesapeake Children's Museum Delegate Busch 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0358 (SB0257) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Montgomery County - Sandy Spring Museum Delegate Zucker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0580 (SB0352) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - National Electronics Museum Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0973 (SB0723) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Kids International Discovery Museum Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2013 - 10:00 AM
HB1039 (SB0883) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - The Baltimore Museum of Industry Capital Improvements Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1148 /CH0297 (SB0592/CH0296) Natural Resources - Shark Fins - Restriction on Possession or Distribution Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Environmental Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1473 Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Arthur & Mary E. Ridgley, Sr. Museum Phase I Delegate Griffith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1516 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2003 - Baltimore City - Carroll Mansion Museum Delegate McHale 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1521 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2005 - Baltimore City - Babe Ruth Birthplace and Museum Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0046 Natural Resources - Shark or Elasmobranch Fins - Restriction on Possession, Distribution, or Consumption Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0257 (HB0358) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Montgomery County - Sandy Spring Museum Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0352 (HB0580) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - National Electronics Museum Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0592 /CH0296 (HB1148/CH0297) Natural Resources - Shark Fins - Restriction on Possession or Distribution Senator Frosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
SB0723 (HB0973) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Kids International Discovery Museum Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 AM
SB0883 (HB1039) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - The Baltimore Museum of Industry Capital Improvements Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 10:00 AM
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1050 Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - College Park Aviation Museum Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 11:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM